Case: 13-90-00054-CV
13-90-00054-CV
02/14/1990
Personal Injuries/Damages
Lozano, Juan
Red Ewald, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/08/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/21/1991 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Overruled | |
02/21/1991 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Overruled | |
02/21/1991 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/28/1990 | Submitted | | |
11/28/1990 | Submission | | |
10/25/1990 | Entry of Judge Selection for Case. | | |
09/13/1990 | Submission | | |
07/31/1990 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/18/1990 | Appellee's Brief Received | | |
07/18/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
07/18/1990 | Oral argument requested | | |
07/09/1990 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
06/22/1990 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
06/22/1990 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/14/1990 | Appellant's Brief Received | | |
06/14/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
06/14/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/14/1990 | No oral argument requested | | |
05/25/1990 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
05/24/1990 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
05/24/1990 | Response to _____________. | | |
05/15/1990 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
05/15/1990 | Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks | | |
05/15/1990 | Statement of Facts Received | | |
05/14/1990 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
05/14/1990 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
05/03/1990 | Mot for Ext Stat of Facts Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/03/1990 | Opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed | |
04/12/1990 | Letter brief filed | | |
04/10/1990 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
04/05/1990 | Affidavit Filed | | |
04/05/1990 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
04/05/1990 | Response to _____________. | | |
04/03/1990 | Response to _____________. | | |
03/30/1990 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
03/28/1990 | Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts | | |
03/27/1990 | Due date for record to be filed | | |
03/21/1990 | Motion for Affirmance of Judgment | | |
03/21/1990 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
03/15/1990 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Carried with the case | |
03/15/1990 | Motion for leave to file Supp. Trans. DISPOSED | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/28/1990 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
02/28/1990 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
02/28/1990 | Motion for leave to file supplemental transcript | | |
02/20/1990 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
02/14/1990 | Supplemental transcript filed | | |
02/14/1990 | Supplemental transcript recieved | | |
02/14/1990 | Transcript Filed | | |
02/14/1990 | Transcript Received | | |
02/14/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/08/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
357th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Roberto Garza
88-09-5991-E