Case: PD-0176-90
PD-0176-90
02/15/1990
PDR Case Type
WILLIAMS, MICHAEL CHARLES
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/27/1990 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
04/11/1990 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
03/21/1990 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
02/15/1990 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/07/1990 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Williams, Michael Charles | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Michael Charles Williams |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Mike Guarino |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-89-00278-CR
Aff 1-18-90
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
212th District Court
Galveston
Honorable Ed J. Harris
87CR1065