Case: 13-90-00051-CR
13-90-00051-CR
02/13/1990
Burglary
Sewell, Gary B.
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/09/1991 | Cite for opinions | | |
11/29/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/04/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
09/06/1990 | Submitted | | |
09/06/1990 | Submission | | |
09/04/1990 | Entry of Judge Selection for Case. | | |
08/02/1990 | Submission | | |
06/19/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
05/25/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
05/25/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/10/1990 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/26/1990 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
04/25/1990 | Green card in | | |
04/23/1990 | 10 day letter sent | | |
03/23/1990 | Due date for record to be filed | | |
03/13/1990 | Transcript Filed | | |
02/28/1990 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
02/28/1990 | Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks | | |
02/28/1990 | Statement of Facts Received | | |
02/13/1990 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
02/13/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/19/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
36th District Court
San Patricio
Honorable Ronald Yeager
7582
15 yrs tdc/fine/restit.