Case Information: 33767 | |||
Short Caption: | REICH VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR953073 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Agosti | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/09/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/18/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-01081 | |
02/18/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
02/23/1999 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Request for Counsel filed in district court on February 17, 1999. Mailed on: 2/19/99. | 99-01218 | |
03/02/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 20 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. | 99-01409 | |
03/09/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 3/5/99. | 99-01645 | |
03/09/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/28/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Remand. Judgment: " . . . we remand this matter to the district court for reconsideration of appellant's petition." fn2[The Honorable Robert Rose, Chief Justice, participated in the decision of this case in the place of the Honorable Deborah A. Agosti, Justice, who voluntarily recused herself. We have received and considered appellant's proper person documents]. SNP99A-RR/WM/NB | 99-03377 | |
05/25/1999 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 99-04309 | |
05/25/1999 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/02/1999 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 28, 1999. | 99-04309 |