judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0815-89
PD-0815-89
06/06/1989
PDR Case Type
COOPER, AARON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/27/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/10/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
COOPER, AARONApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Mr. Richard Frankoff
Henry L. Burkholder III
Court of Appeals Information:
01-86-00032-CR
Rev & Rem 3-23-89
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
425105