Case: C-9556
C-9556
02/21/1990
Probable juris noted
TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF BUSINESS
TEXAS AIR CONTROL BOARD AND TEXAS WATER COMMISSION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/22/1993 | Letter brief | Appellant in case | Texas Association of Business letter br reply to Ape's suppl letter br in support of mo/re | |
04/16/1993 | Letter brief | Appellee in case | upplemental letter brief in support of Mo/Re | |
03/24/1993 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Appellant in case | Appellant's statement regarding rehearing - will not file mo/re | |
03/22/1993 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Appellant in case | | |
03/18/1993 | Motion for Rehearing | Appellee's motion for rehearing of a cause filed | on behalf of Lone Star Chapter of the Sierra Club | |
03/17/1993 | Motion for Rehearing | Appellee's motion for rehearing of a cause filed | behalf of Texas Air Control Board & Texas Water Commission | |
02/15/1991 | Post submission brief filed | Petitioner | Transcript of Oral Argument | |
01/29/1991 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | on behalf of TX Trial Lawyers Association, Atty Steven K. Hayes, Busby & Assoc 2109 Bird Creek Terrace, Temple TX 76502, 817/778-4855. | |
01/21/1991 | Appellees' Brief filed | Appellee in case | on behalf of Texas Air Control Board and Texas Water Commission on standing issues | |
01/21/1991 | Appellees' Brief filed | Appellee in case | "BRIEF ON STANDING OF LONE STAR CHAPTER OF THE SIERRA CLUB" | |
01/21/1991 | Letter brief | Appellee in case | Response of League Of Women Voters of Texas to Clerk's Dec 12, 1990 letter Requesting Additional briefing and argument of Texas Assoc. of Business | |
01/07/1991 | Appellant's Brief filed | on issue of standing | | |
07/16/1990 | Appellees' Brief filed | Appellee in case | OF TX AIR CONTROL BOARD & TX WATER COMMISSION. | |
07/16/1990 | Appellees' Brief filed | Appellee in case | OF LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS. | |
07/13/1990 | Letter brief | Appellant in case | REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. | |
06/01/1990 | Appellees' Brief filed | Appellee in case | OF LONE STAR CHAPTER OF THE SIERRA CLUB | |
05/07/1990 | Appellant's Brief filed | Appellant in case | | |
02/21/1990 | Direct Appeal filed | Appellant in case | APPELLANT'S BR DUE | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/28/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date. | | |
06/28/1993 | list missing briefs when case is separated(remarks | No Originals of: Ape's m/e/t to file Br. (05-22-90), Ape's m/e/t to file Br. (05-23-90), Ape's Br. (06-01-90), Ant's Addendum (08-01-90) | | |
06/28/1993 | list missing briefs when case is separated(remarks | No Originals of: Ant's m/e/t to file Br. (03-16-90), Ant's 2nd m/e/t to file Br. (04-18-90), Ant's Br. (05-07-90), Ant's Ltr. Br. (05-15-90) (cont.) | | |
06/28/1993 | Mandate issued | 852 SW2d 440 | | |
05/05/1993 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | motion for rehearing overruled. Justice___not sit | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
05/05/1993 | Corrected opinion | CORRECTIVE CC W/MINOR TEXTUAL CHANGES ONLY SENT TO ALL PARTIES & PUBLISHERS | | |
05/05/1993 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | motion for rehearing overruled. Justice___not sit | BEHALF/LONE STAR CHAPTER OF SIERRA CLUB (J. HIGHTOWER NOT SITTING) | |
05/05/1993 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | motion for rehearing overruled. Justice___not sit | BEHALF/TX AIR CONTROL BD & TX WATER COMM'N (J.HIGHTOWER NOT SITTING) | |
04/22/1993 | Letter brief | Texas Association of Business letter br reply to Ape's suppl letter br in support of mo/re | | |
04/16/1993 | Letter brief | upplemental letter brief in support of Mo/Re | | |
03/24/1993 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | Appellant's statement regarding rehearing - will not file mo/re | | |
03/22/1993 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposed | Filing granted | Mo/Re due 04-18-93 | |
03/22/1993 | Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed | | | |
03/18/1993 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing | | | |
03/18/1993 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
03/18/1993 | Motion for Rehearing | on behalf of Lone Star Chapter of the Sierra Club | | |
03/17/1993 | Conditional motion for rehearing | No description available. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
03/17/1993 | Motion for Rehearing | behalf of Texas Air Control Board & Texas Water Commission | | |
03/17/1993 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remains in clerk's office | | |
03/04/1993 | Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record | JUDGMENT OF TRIAL CT REV/PT & AFF/PT | | |
03/03/1993 | Concurring and Dissenting Opinion delivered | BY J.DOGGETT | | |
03/03/1993 | Concurring and Dissenting Opinion delivered | BY J.SPECTOR | | |
03/03/1993 | Concurring and Dissenting Opinion delivered | BY J.GAMMAGE | | |
03/03/1993 | Opinion issued | Court affirms and reverses in part and renders judgment | BY J. CORNYN (J.HIGHTOWER NOT SITTING) 3 SEPARATE CON & DIS OPNS EA BY JJ. DOGGETT, GAMMAGE, AND SPECTOR. 852 SW2d 440 | |
03/03/1993 | Opinion issued | Court affirms and reverses in part and renders judgment | BY J. CORNYN (J.HIGHTOWER NOT SITTING) 3 SEPARATE CON & DIS OPNS EA BY JJ. DOGGETT, GAMMAGE, AND SPECTOR. 852 SW2d 440 | |
03/03/1993 | Opinion issued | Court affirms and reverses in part and renders judgment | BY J. CORNYN (J.HIGHTOWER NOT SITTING) 3 SEPARATE CON & DIS OPNS EA BY JJ. DOGGETT, GAMMAGE, AND SPECTOR. 852 SW2d 440 | |
03/03/1993 | Opinion issued | Court affirms and reverses in part and renders judgment | BY J. CORNYN (J.HIGHTOWER NOT SITTING) 3 SEPARATE CON & DIS OPNS EA BY JJ. DOGGETT, GAMMAGE, AND SPECTOR. 852 SW2d 440 | |
05/29/1992 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Call made to the 250th District Court to request exhibits in case | | |
02/15/1991 | Post submission brief filed | Transcript of Oral Argument | | |
02/06/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info. | | |
02/06/1991 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date. | | |
02/06/1991 | Oral argument | argued for pet by Doug Alexander and James Checkley, Jr. for resp by Nancy N. Lynch and Mary E. Kelly | ||
01/31/1991 | Amount of time allotted for oral argument. | 25/25 minutes | | |
01/31/1991 | Correction filed (See Remarks) | Correction to brief filed on January 21, 1991. | | |
01/29/1991 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | on behalf of TX Trial Lawyers Association, Atty Steven K. Hayes, Busby & Assoc 2109 Bird Creek Terrace, Temple TX 76502, 817/778-4855. | | |
01/21/1991 | Appellees' Brief filed | on behalf of Texas Air Control Board and Texas Water Commission on standing issues | | |
01/21/1991 | Appellees' Brief filed | "BRIEF ON STANDING OF LONE STAR CHAPTER OF THE SIERRA CLUB" | | |
01/21/1991 | Letter brief | Response of League Of Women Voters of Texas to Clerk's Dec 12, 1990 letter Requesting Additional briefing and argument of Texas Assoc. of Business | | |
01/16/1991 | Supplemental Transcript filed | FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL TRANSCRIPT | | |
01/07/1991 | Appellant's Brief filed | on issue of standing | | |
12/12/1990 | Direct Appeal disposed | Jurisdiction noted in Direct Appeal. | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
12/12/1990 | Appellant's Brief Due | Addt'l briefing requested due 1/7/91 concern.standing of TAB to br.suit in dist.court under/Declaratory Judgments Act. | | |
12/12/1990 | Appellee's Brief Due | Addt'l briefing req. due 1/21/91 concern.standing of TAB to bring suit in dist.ct. under Declaratory Judgments Act. | | |
12/12/1990 | Direct Appeal disposed | Jurisdiction noted in Direct Appeal. | BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ORAL ARGUMENT SET | |
12/12/1990 | Set for Submission | (J.Hightower not sitting) | | |
09/18/1990 | No description available. | | | |
08/01/1990 | Addendum to brief filed | CORRECTIONS TO APPENDICES FILED 7-16 | | |
07/16/1990 | Appellees' Brief filed | OF LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS. | | |
07/16/1990 | Appellees' Brief filed | OF TX AIR CONTROL BOARD & TX WATER COMMISSION. | | |
07/16/1990 | Appendix to any instrument | OF TX AIR CONTROL BOARD & TX WATER COMMISSION | | |
07/13/1990 | Letter brief | REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT. | | |
06/01/1990 | Appellees' Brief filed | OF LONE STAR CHAPTER OF THE SIERRA CLUB | | |
05/25/1990 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | ON BEHALF OF THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS | |
05/24/1990 | MET to file reply disposed of | Filing granted | ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF TEXAS. | |
05/23/1990 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | OF THE LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS | | |
05/22/1990 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | OF THE STATE OF TEXAS. | | |
05/15/1990 | Letter Filed | LTR FROM ATTY KIDD, ADVISING COURT OF SUBSTITUTION, ATTY DOUGLAS W. ALEXANDER SUBSTITUTING FOR ATTY KIDD. | | |
05/07/1990 | Appellant's Brief filed | | | |
04/20/1990 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | | |
04/18/1990 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | M/E/T TO FILE ANT'S BR. | | |
03/20/1990 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Filing granted | M/E/T TO FILE ANT'S BR. | |
03/16/1990 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | M/E/T TO FILE ANT'S BR. | | |
02/21/1990 | Direct Appeal filed | APPELLANT'S BR DUE | | |
02/21/1990 | Statement of facts filed in habeas corpus | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
06/28/1993 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
TX AIR CONTROL BOARD ET AL. | Appellee | Ms. Linda B. Secord |
LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF TX | Appellee | Mr. William D. Dugat III Mr. Douglas G. Caroom |
TEXAS AIR CONTROL BOARD | Appellee | Ms. Nancy N. Lynch |
TEXAS WATER COMMISSION | Appellee | Ms. Nancy N. Lynch Mr. Dan Morales |
SIERRA CLUB | Appellee | Ms. Mary E. Kelly Ms. Amy R. Johnson |
TEXAS ASSOCIATION OF BUSINESS | Appellant | Mr. Albert R. Axe Jr. Mr. R. Kinnan Golemon Mr. James W. Checkley Jr. Mr. Douglas W. Alexander |
STATE OF TEXAS | Appellee | Ms. Nancy N. Lynch |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
250th District Court
Travis
Honorable Harley Clark
393,120