Case: 07-90-00022-CV
07-90-00022-CV
02/20/1990
Miscellaneous civil
Hy Fishman Furs, Inc.
Shelton, James D., et ux., and Hartford Lloyd's Ins. Co.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/24/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/24/1990 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
09/19/1990 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
03/21/1990 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | GRANT | |
02/20/1990 | Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed | | |
02/20/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/07/1990 | Motion - Ext to File Bond Disp | GRANT | |
01/25/1990 | Motion - Ext. to File Bond | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/24/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hartford Ins. Co. | Appellee | Adair Buckner |
Hy Fishman Furs, Inc. | Appellant | Daniel W. Burrows |
Sheltons | Appellee | Michael R. Sanders |
Trial Court Information
47th District Court
Randall
Honorable David Wesley Gulley
29,696-A