Case: 14-90-00231-CV
14-90-00231-CV
03/16/1990
Miscellaneous civil
Orkin Exterminating Company, Inc.
Property Trust of America d/b/a The Citadel Apartments
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/23/1990 | Case stored | | |
10/18/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/18/1990 | Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | GRANTED | |
10/18/1990 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
10/18/1990 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
10/18/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/17/1990 | Submitted | | |
10/17/1990 | Submission | | |
10/17/1990 | Submitted | | |
10/11/1990 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
10/11/1990 | Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | | |
09/24/1990 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/29/1990 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
07/30/1990 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
07/12/1990 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
07/10/1990 | Amended motion FILED - ANT,APE,APP,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/26/1990 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
04/12/1990 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
03/30/1990 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
03/16/1990 | Transcript FILED | | |
03/16/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
01/03/1990 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |
12/04/1989 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/07/2011 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | Richard L. Ellison |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | C. Henry Kollenberg |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | Hon. Hugh P. Touchy |
Trial Court Information
215th District Court
Harris
Honorable EUGENE CHAMBERS
85-23141