Case: PD-1493-89
PD-1493-89
11/30/1989
PDR Case Type
BERGER, BRUCE ALBERT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/29/1989 | RESPONSE FILED | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/16/1990 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
01/31/1990 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
12/29/1989 | RESPONSE FILED | | |
11/30/1989 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/26/1990 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BERGER, BRUCE ALBERT | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Stanley I. Weinberg |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John C. Vance |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-87-01338-CR
Rev & Rem 10-5-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 2 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable LARRY W. BARAKA
F83-91106-KI