Case: 01-89-01152-CV
01-89-01152-CV
11/28/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Wu, Henry, Inc. and Hugesen Enterprise, U.S.A., Inc.
Rex Machinery Movers, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
02/27/1990 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | |
02/26/1990 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | | |
02/26/1990 | Order entered | | |
01/12/1990 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
01/12/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/12/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/28/1989 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
12/19/1989 | Docket statement received from party | | |
12/08/1989 | Filing fee paid | | |
11/28/1989 | Transcript filed | | |
11/28/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/16/1989 | Appeal bond filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/26/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Appellant | Stuart N. Wilson |
State | Appellee | Douglas A. Sandvig |
Trial Court Information
55th District Court
Harris
88-57129