Case: 12-99-00453-CR
12-99-00453-CR
12/15/1999
Other Drug Possession
Murphy, Mary Ann
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/07/2000 | | ||
07/31/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/31/2000 | Case stored | | |
05/25/2000 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |
05/10/2000 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
04/25/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction | |
04/19/2000 | Submitted | | |
03/29/2000 | Letter to Submit w/o Argument | | |
03/29/2000 | Submission | | |
03/10/2000 | Prescreened | | |
03/08/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
03/08/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/22/2000 | Supp Record Filed (show in remarks by: CLK or RPT) | | |
02/17/2000 | Supp Record Filed (show in remarks by: CLK or RPT) | | |
02/10/2000 | Brief Filed | | |
01/14/2000 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Overruled | |
01/10/2000 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
01/10/2000 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
12/29/1999 | Mtn for ext of time to file notice of appeal | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/27/1999 | Motion to Extend Time to File Notice of Appeal | | |
12/27/1999 | Docketing Statement | | |
12/27/1999 | Reporters Record Filed | | |
12/17/1999 | Dismissal Letter in Criminal Case for no/late NOA | | |
12/15/1999 | Notice for Criminal Docketing Statement | | |
12/15/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
12/10/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/08/1999 | Motion For New Trial filed in trial court | | |
09/09/1999 | Date Sentence Given in Open Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/31/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
07/31/2025 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Ms. Nicole D. Lostracco |
Murphy, Mary Ann | Criminal - Appellant | Mr. Mark W. Cargill |
Trial Court Information
145th District Court
Nacogdoches
8024-98-8
15 yrs/TDCJ-ID & $2000 fine