judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-89-00147-CV
10-89-00147-CV
06/06/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Dresser Industries, Inc. and Houston Fishing Tools Company
Page Petroleum, Inc., et al
No
14th Court of Appeals
06/06/1989
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/07/2002Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/30/1994Case stored
01/31/1994Mandate issued by this Court
12/15/1993Opinion issuedDismissed
12/06/1993Motion to Dismiss filed
11/05/1993Motion to Dismiss filed
08/18/1993Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/13/1993Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
07/19/1993Case returned from higher court
07/19/1993Cause reinstated after remanded from higher court.
07/19/1993Mandate issued by this Court
07/19/1993Cause reinstated after remanded from higher court.
06/09/1993Motion for Rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/09/1993Motion for Rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/07/1993Opinion issuedAff/Rev & Remanded to App Ct
06/24/1992(NO ACK) Writ disposed.Motion or Writ Granted
02/24/1992Case forwarded to higher court
02/14/1992No Description Available.
02/14/1992No Description Available.
01/15/1992Motion for Rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/15/1992Motion for Rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/08/1992No Description Available.
01/08/1992No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/08/1992No Description Available.
01/03/1992No Description Available.
12/31/1991Motion for extension of time to file rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/23/1991Response to motion
12/19/1991Motion for extension of time to file rehearing
12/19/1991No Description Available.
12/04/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
12/04/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
12/04/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
10/30/1991Dismissal on Order with no OpinionMotion or Writ Granted
05/07/1991No Description Available.
05/03/1991No Description Available.
04/29/1991No Description Available.
04/29/1991No Description Available.
04/29/1991No Description Available.
04/18/1991No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/18/1991Submitted
04/18/1991Submission
04/15/1991No Description Available.
02/22/1991Submission
12/12/1989Response to motion
12/05/1989No Description Available.
10/27/1989Motion for dismissal filed
10/13/1989Response to motion
10/12/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/06/1989No Description Available.
09/29/1989No Description Available.
09/25/1989No Description Available.
09/21/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/08/1989No Description Available.
09/01/1989No Description Available.
08/31/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/22/1989Motion for dismissal filed
08/21/1989No Description Available.
08/17/1989No Description Available.
07/20/1989No Description Available.
07/06/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/19/1989No Description Available.
06/06/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
05/11/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/19/1989No Description Available.
04/19/1989No Description Available.
04/19/1989No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/07/2002Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rupertsland Resources, Inc.AppelleeL. H. Warburton, Jr.
John St. JohnAppelleeL. H. Warburton, Jr.
Dynasty Oil CorporationAppelleeL. H. Warburton, Jr.
Dresser Industries, Inc.AppellantKent C. Sullivan
Kaztex Joint VentureAppelleeL. H. Warburton, Jr.
Houston Fishing Tools CompanyAppellantJennifer Bruch Hogan
Page Petroleum, Inc.AppelleeJ. G. Adami, Jr.
Bowen Tools, Inc.AppelleeJess Hall, Jr.
Knox Industries, Inc.AppelleeL. H. Warburton, Jr.
Map 1981-1 Partnership DrillinAppelleeL. H. Warburton, Jr.
Trial Court Information
25th District Court
Colorado
Honorable B. B. Schraub
15,365