Case: 08-83-00104-CV
08-83-00104-CV
05/03/1983
Miscellaneous civil
Gibson Distributing Co., Inc. d/b/a Gibson's Discount Center
Leugers, Patricia
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/01/1985 | Shuck purged | | |
04/26/1984 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/22/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/16/1983 | Submitted | | |
12/14/1983 | Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc. | | |
12/08/1983 | Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc. | | |
10/12/1983 | Submission | | |
10/03/1983 | Reply brief filed. | | |
09/01/1983 | Brief Filed | | |
08/17/1983 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/01/1983 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
07/20/1983 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/08/1983 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
06/13/1983 | Brief Filed | | |
05/23/1983 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
05/23/1983 | Transcript Filed | | |
05/13/1983 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
05/03/1983 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/26/1984 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown | Appellant | |
Unknown | Appellee | |
Unknown | Appellant |
Trial Court Information
205th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam W. Callan
82-6206