judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00146-CR
02-89-00146-CR
06/05/1989
Burglary
Rolla, Robert Jacob
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/15/1990Mandate Issued
08/29/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/25/1990Submitted
04/25/1990Submission
04/24/1990Order Entered
02/28/1990Brief Filed
01/11/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/10/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/12/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/11/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/15/1989Brief Filed
11/15/1989Submission
10/17/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/17/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/15/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/15/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/17/1989Exhibits Filed
07/17/1989No Description Available.
07/03/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/03/1989No Description Available.
07/03/1989No Description Available.
06/05/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
06/05/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/15/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rolla, Robert JacobCriminal - Appellant
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
297th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Leo Everett Young
0303607A
75 yrs., TDC