Case: 01-83-00261-CR
01-83-00261-CR
04/25/1983
Theft
Franklin, Isaac
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/06/1984 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
06/04/1984 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
05/30/1984 | No description available. | | |
04/05/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/27/1984 | Submitted | | |
03/02/1984 | Submission | | |
01/04/1984 | Brief filed | | |
12/22/1983 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
12/20/1983 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
12/05/1983 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
11/03/1983 | Brief filed | | |
10/06/1983 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
09/27/1983 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
09/08/1983 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
09/01/1983 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
08/11/1983 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
08/03/1983 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
07/08/1983 | Record filed | | |
04/25/1983 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/06/1984 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - Appellant | |
State | Criminal - State of Texas |
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
354660
8 years TDC