Case: 01-00-00171-CV
01-00-00171-CV
02/29/2000
Miscellaneous/other civil
Mobile Mechanic
Melissa Earls
No
11th Court of Appeals
03/07/2000
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/04/2000 | Scheduling Conference set | | |
03/07/2000 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | |
03/07/2000 | order issued, case stayed or abated. | Otherwise disposed | |
03/07/2000 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | |
02/29/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/23/2000 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |
02/23/2000 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |
02/14/2000 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | | |
02/08/2000 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/07/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
JUDGE, TRIAL | Trial court judge | Hon. Ed Landry (Visiting Judge) |
MECHANIC, MOBILE | Appellant | Larry Miller |
EARLS, MELISSA | Appellee | Melissa Earls |
REPORTER, COURT | Court reporter | Tony Baiamonte |
COUNTY CLERK | County clerk |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 1
Harris
Honorable ED LANDRY
723750