judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COUNTY OF CLARK VS. BANK OF AMERICA

Case Information: 33740
Short Caption:COUNTY OF CLARK VS. BANK OF AMERICACourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33380
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A354402
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A355979
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A357947
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/04/1999 / Elliott-Tavano, JenniferSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/11/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin.
02/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00960
02/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Notice of entry of order for 7/29/98 order. Due Date: 10 days
03/04/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jennifer Elliott-Tavano. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
03/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. 99-01833
03/24/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned, unfiled the original and three copies of the docketing statement. (Not on form provided). Re-mailed copy of docketing statement.
03/25/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 12/1/98 through 12/3/98. To Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 99-02172
03/29/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 12/02/98 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 99-02258
04/05/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 12/3/98. Court Reporter: Joy Hinck. 99-02537
04/05/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Permission to File Late Docketing Statement. 99-02538
04/05/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 4/8/99. 99-02541
04/05/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-02540
04/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on April 5, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-02566
04/12/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 5/25/99. 99-02768
07/27/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-06801
08/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: July 30, 1998. 99-07323
08/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Re: Jurisdiction. Response due: 30 days. 99-07950
09/23/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. 99-09053
12/15/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-12635
01/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-00428
01/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/24/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2000. 00-00428