Case: 01-00-00174-CV
01-00-00174-CV
02/29/2000
Summary judgment
Goss, Sonny David
Carlos J. Puig, D.O. and Puig Medical Griop, Texas, P.A.
No
11th Court of Appeals
03/07/2000
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/04/2000 | Scheduling Conference set | | |
03/22/2000 | Record due | | |
03/07/2000 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | |
03/07/2000 | order issued, case stayed or abated. | Otherwise disposed | |
03/07/2000 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | |
02/29/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/24/2000 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |
02/21/2000 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
12/13/1999 | Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21) | | |
11/23/1999 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/07/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
District Clerk, District | District clerk | Charles Bacarisse |
JUDGE, TRIAL | Trial court judge | Hon. John Devine |
GOSS, SONNY DAVID | Appellant | Scott Cohron Crutchfield Michael W. Lockhart Terry W. Wood |
CARLOS J. PUIG, D.O. AND PUIG | Appellee | Mark T. Phelps Donald M. Hudgins |
REPORTER, COURT | Court reporter | My Thuy Cieslar |
Trial Court Information
190th District Court
Harris
Honorable JOHN P. DEVINE
9654275