Case: 01-00-00162-CV
01-00-00162-CV
02/29/2000
Damages
Hernandez, Arthur Wayne
Segler Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a Darque Tan
No
11th Court of Appeals
03/07/2000
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/20/2000 | Scheduling Conference set | | |
03/11/2000 | Record due | | |
03/07/2000 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | |
03/07/2000 | order issued, case stayed or abated. | Otherwise disposed | |
03/07/2000 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion | |
02/29/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
02/15/2000 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |
02/14/2000 | Motion to withdraw as counsel filed - no new attorney to substitute in as counsel | | |
02/11/2000 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
11/30/1999 | Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21) | | |
11/12/1999 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/07/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
HERNANDEZ, ARTHUR WAYNE | Appellant | Alan Louis Winograd |
SEGLER ENTERPRISES, INC., D/B/ | Appellee | Nicholas J. Lanza |
JUDGE, TRIAL | Trial court judge | Hon. John T. Wooldridge |
District Clerk, District | District clerk | Charles Bacarisse |
REPORTER, COURT | Court reporter | Loretta Korzeb |
Trial Court Information
269th District Court
Harris
Honorable John T. Wooldridge
9722999