judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0804-89
PD-0804-89
06/06/1989
PDR Case Type
CRAWFORD, EDWARD FRANCIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/1989FINAL DISPRefused
09/27/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/07/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CRAWFORD, EDWARD FRANCISApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Patricia R. Saum
STATE OF TEXASStateRonald Sutton
Court of Appeals Information:
04-88-00057-CR
Aff 3-31-89
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
198th District Court
Kimble
Honorable CHARLES SHERRILL
370