judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MCMULLEN, ROBERT PFB

Case Information: 82-AA-0855
Short Caption:MCMULLEN, ROBERT PFBClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Police/Fire Retire/Relief Bd.
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:07/16/1982

Opening Event Date:07/16/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/28/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/28/1982
Argued/Submitted:02/03/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCMULLEN, ROBERT PFB
07/16/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/28/1982FiledRecord Completed
10/28/1982FiledBriefing Completed
02/03/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/27/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition