Case: 14-98-00581-CV
14-98-00581-CV
05/19/1998
Medical Malpractice
Cecil Ray Blan, Mary Blan, William Blan, Michael Blan, Richard Blan and Lori Bender
Abdul Ali, M.D. and Dennis Lee Bartasis, D.O.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/11/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
02/10/2000 | Case stored | | |
02/02/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
02/02/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/27/2000 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
01/03/2000 | Petition for Review DUE | | |
12/03/1999 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
11/18/1999 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
11/18/1999 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
05/28/1999 | Post submission brief FILED - ANT,APE | | |
05/25/1999 | Submitted | | |
05/25/1999 | Submission | | |
05/25/1999 | Submitted | | |
04/29/1999 | Submission | | |
08/20/1998 | Court fee due | | |
08/11/1998 | Reply Brief Filed | | |
07/27/1998 | Appellee's brief DUE | | |
07/27/1998 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
07/22/1998 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
07/15/1998 | Mediation Docketing Statement FILED | | |
06/30/1998 | Mediation Docketing Statement FILED | | |
06/29/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
06/25/1998 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/25/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/25/1998 | Docketing Statement FILED | | |
06/25/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/18/1998 | Mediation Docketing Statement FILED | | |
06/08/1998 | No reporter's record DUE to be filed | | |
06/01/1998 | No Reporter's Record in Civil case FILED | | |
05/29/1998 | Docketing statement DUE | | |
05/28/1998 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |
05/27/1998 | Record due | | |
05/27/1998 | Reporter's Record Due | | |
05/19/1998 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |
05/19/1998 | Court fee due | | |
05/19/1998 | Notice for Docketing Statement FILED | | |
05/19/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
04/23/1998 | Docketing Statement FILED | | |
04/23/1998 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
02/18/1998 | Motion for new trial FILED | | |
01/27/1998 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/11/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CECIL BLAN, MARY BLAN, WILLIAM | Appellant | Howard L. Glass |
ABDUL ALI, M.D. AND DENNIS LEE | Appellee | Richard F. Callaway, Jr. Joseph R. Alexander |
Trial Court Information
295th District Court
Harris
Honorable TRACY KEE CHRISTOPHER
96-44527