judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JACKSON, REGINALD A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CF-0990
Short Caption:JACKSON, REGINALD A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7272-81Filed Date:08/12/1983

Opening Event Date:08/12/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/26/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/03/1985
Argued/Submitted:11/12/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppellantJohn Doe N
James H. Tatem NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Daniel J. Slattery YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mona C. Mack YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JACKSON, REGINALD A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 VACATED RICHARD S. STOLKER TATEMJ VACATED - 1/17/85
08/12/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/26/1984FiledRecord Completed
07/03/1985FiledBriefing Completed
11/12/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/14/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition