judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SCOTT, CLARENCE H. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CF-0971
Short Caption:SCOTT, CLARENCE H. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:08/04/1983

Opening Event Date:08/04/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/02/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/26/1984
Argued/Submitted:06/27/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Claudia E. Schlosberg NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Sharon M. Collins YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SCOTT, CLARENCE H. AKA CLARENCE SCOTT, JR. UNITED STATES
08/04/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/02/1983FiledRecord Completed
03/26/1984FiledBriefing Completed
06/27/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
08/23/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition