judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00501-CR
14-89-00501-CR
06/06/1989
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Yuhl, Edgar B.
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/22/1990Case stored
05/11/1990Mandate Issued
05/11/1990Mandate Issued
04/25/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
03/28/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
01/29/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
01/17/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
01/11/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/11/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
12/07/1989Submitted
12/07/1989Submission
12/07/1989Submitted
11/07/1989Submission
10/24/1989Reply Brief Filed
10/19/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/19/1989Case ready to be set
10/19/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/19/1989Case ready to be set
10/16/1989Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
10/09/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/21/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/07/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/10/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/07/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
08/03/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
07/24/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
07/24/1989Transcript FILED
06/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/25/1989Date of Sentence
05/25/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasHon. Katherine Haden
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantBrian W. Wice
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable JOE KEGANS
510,714
60 years TDC/$5,000 fine