Case: 13-98-00540-CV
13-98-00540-CV
10/13/1998
Miscellaneous civil
Colonial County Mutual Insurance Company
Valdez, Hector
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/21/2006 | Record sent to storage | | |||
04/24/2001 | Cite for opinions | | |||
11/17/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/31/2000 | Opinion issued | As Reformed, Affirmed |
| ||
01/03/2000 | Letter filed | | |||
12/09/1999 | Submitted | | |||
12/09/1999 | Submission | | |||
11/15/1999 | Letter sent | | |||
11/10/1999 | Address Change | | |||
11/03/1999 | Entry of Judge Selection for Case. | | |||
11/03/1999 | Submission | | |||
05/13/1999 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||
05/13/1999 | Mo ext. of time to file REPLY BRIEF Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
05/06/1999 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
05/06/1999 | Mo -ext of time to file REPLY BRIEF | | |||
04/15/1999 | Brief Filed | | |||
04/15/1999 | Oral argument requested | | |||
03/17/1999 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/08/1999 | Additional copies of motion for extension of time | | |||
03/08/1999 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
03/05/1999 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
02/12/1999 | Brief Filed | | |||
01/14/1999 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/08/1999 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
01/08/1999 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
12/11/1998 | Court Reporter Pages | | |||
12/11/1998 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
12/11/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
12/02/1998 | docketing statement received | | |||
12/02/1998 | Statement Filed | | |||
11/17/1998 | Notice for docketing statement | | |||
11/13/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
11/10/1998 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |||
11/09/1998 | request for documents | | |||
10/13/1998 | docketing statement received | | |||
10/13/1998 | Filing Fee Paid | | |||
10/13/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
10/13/1998 | Statement Filed | | |||
10/13/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/17/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Valdez, Hector | Appellee | Hon. Richard E. Zayas |
Colonial County Mutual Insuran | Appellant | Richard H. Grafton Jessie A. Amos |
Trial Court Information
197th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Darrell Hester
96-08-4395-C