Case: 14-89-01080-CV
14-89-01080-CV
11/21/1989
Divorce
State of Texas on Behalf of Ojala, Carol Willing
Willing, Charles
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/13/1990 | Case stored | | |
11/08/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/08/1990 | Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | GRANTED | |
11/08/1990 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
11/08/1990 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
11/08/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
10/30/1990 | Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | | |
10/05/1990 | Submission | | |
03/15/1990 | Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | DENIED | |
03/12/1990 | Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA | | |
03/05/1990 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
03/05/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/05/1990 | Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | | |
03/05/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/22/1990 | Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
02/22/1990 | Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP | | |
02/08/1990 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
02/08/1990 | Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STA | GRANTED | |
02/08/1990 | No description available. | | |
02/06/1990 | Extend time to file statement of facts FILED | | |
02/01/1990 | Brf.RECD.ARGU.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA | | |
02/01/1990 | Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA | | |
01/22/1990 | Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA | | |
01/05/1990 | Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL | | |
11/22/1989 | Transcript FILED | | |
11/21/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/29/1989 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/13/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee | Edward E. Lindsay |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | Frederick Krasny |
Trial Court Information
309th District Court
Harris
Honorable JOHN D. MONTGOMERY
88-24072