Case: 05-89-01361-CV
05-89-01361-CV
11/21/1989
Oil & Gas
OXY Cities Service NGL, Inc.
Amoco Production Company, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/18/2001 | Order entered | Destroy | |
06/18/2001 | Order Entered | Destroy | |
04/18/2001 | Record Pickup | | |
12/11/1997 | Record Retention | Destroy | |
06/25/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/25/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/17/1991 | Case Returned from Higher Ct. | Dismissed | |
04/03/1991 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
04/03/1991 | MattConv | | |
03/14/1991 | Motion to Publish Opinion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
03/04/1991 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
12/27/1990 | Response to Motion | | |
12/19/1990 | Response to Motion | | |
12/14/1990 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
12/12/1990 | Motion to Publish Opinion | | |
11/29/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/29/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/21/1990 | Letter Filed | | |
11/15/1990 | Letter Filed | | |
09/28/1990 | Response to Motion | | |
09/12/1990 | Response to Motion | | |
09/11/1990 | Submission | | |
09/11/1990 | Submitted | | |
09/11/1990 | Submission | | |
09/11/1990 | Submitted | | |
09/10/1990 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
08/08/1990 | MattConv | | |
05/29/1990 | Submission | | |
04/17/1990 | Motion to Postpone Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/10/1990 | Motion for Postponement | | |
03/21/1990 | MattConv | | |
02/09/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
02/09/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
02/09/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/09/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/08/1990 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
02/07/1990 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |
02/01/1990 | Mot Ext Time File Strans Disp | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/25/1990 | Response to Motion | | |
01/24/1990 | Response to Motion | | |
01/24/1990 | Response to Motion | | |
01/17/1990 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
01/16/1990 | Letter Filed | | |
01/16/1990 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |
01/16/1990 | Mot Ext Time File Strans | | |
01/15/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
01/08/1990 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/03/1990 | MattConv | | |
12/19/1989 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
12/15/1989 | Transcript Filed | | |
12/06/1989 | Mot for Ext Transcript Disp | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/06/1989 | Response to Motion | | |
12/01/1989 | Response to Motion | | |
11/30/1989 | Response to Motion | | |
11/21/1989 | Mot - Ext. to File Transcript | | |
11/21/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
10/25/1989 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
09/25/1989 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/18/2001 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe Kendall
89-11425-H