Case: 09-99-00581-CR
09-99-00581-CR
12/08/1999
Extradition
Henry, Derrick
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/12/2000 | Case stored | | |
09/12/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/28/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
05/19/2000 | Submitted | | |
04/28/2000 | 21 Day Submission | | |
04/28/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/25/2000 | Notice of failure to File Brief | | |
12/08/1999 | Clerks Record Filed | | |
12/08/1999 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | | |
12/08/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/12/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Rodney D. Conerly |
Henry, Derrick | Appellant | Derrick Devoid Henry |
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
1914 (71683)