judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-89-00143-CR
10-89-00143-CR
06/06/1989
Other Drug Possession
Carlton Lynch
The State of Texas
No
14th Court of Appeals
06/06/1989
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/17/2016Letter issued by the court
02/16/2016Letter received
09/14/2015Letter issued by the court
09/04/2015Letter received
08/27/2015Letter received
05/15/1990Case stored
05/15/1990Mandate issued by this Court
03/29/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the disposition of a process
06/06/1989Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/15/2090Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Lynch, Carlton AppellantCarlton Lynch
Richard E. Stephanow
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
Honorable Walter S. McMeans
513,103
50 years