judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00498-CR
14-89-00498-CR
06/06/1989
Robbery
Furgison, Raymond Dwight
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/03/1991Case stored
04/27/1991Mandate Issued
04/27/1991Mandate Issued
04/12/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
03/13/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
12/10/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
12/03/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/16/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
11/01/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/01/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/09/1990Submitted
10/09/1990Submission
10/09/1990Submitted
09/12/1990Submission
08/08/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/08/1990Case ready to be set
08/08/1990Case ready to be set
07/12/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/05/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/11/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/07/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/01/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/03/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/26/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/12/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/03/1990No description available.
03/30/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/01/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/22/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/01/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPDENIED
01/30/1990Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
01/26/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
12/14/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/08/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
12/05/1989No description available.
10/05/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/02/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
08/10/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/03/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
07/26/1989Transcript FILED
06/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/02/1989Date of Sentence
06/02/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/03/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantTony Aninao
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasLester Blizzard
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
489,852
50 years TDC