Case: PD-1591-98
PD-1591-98
10/14/1998
PDR Case Type
HARRIS, JOHN JAMES
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/04/1999 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
12/16/1998 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
12/16/1998 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
11/16/1998 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
10/14/1998 | PDR FILED | | |
10/14/1998 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/11/1999 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Harris, John James | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Blake Withrow |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John C. Vance |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-96-00515-CR
AFF 6-15-98
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 3 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable MARK TOLLE
F-9501482-LJ