judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00499-CR
14-89-00499-CR
06/06/1989
Forgery
Villela, Joe Santos
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/21/1990Case stored
08/16/1990Mandate Issued
08/16/1990Motion to withdraw appeal DISPOSED - ANT,APEGRANTED
08/16/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
08/16/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
08/16/1990Mandate Issued
08/08/1990Motion to withdraw appeal FILED
02/06/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/06/1990Case ready to be set
02/06/1990Case ready to be set
01/09/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/30/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/22/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/24/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
08/17/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/14/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
07/31/1989No description available.
07/31/1989Transcript FILED
06/06/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/31/1989Date of Sentence
05/31/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/21/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantArnold S. Cohn
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable CARL WALKER
514,170
15 years TDC/$5000 fine