judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEONARD (GREGORY) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)

Case Information: 33732
Short Caption:LEONARD (GREGORY) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 62800
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C126427Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Direct
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/14/2000 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/14/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/08/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00880
02/08/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
02/19/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (Mailed on: 2/16/99. 99-01122
02/26/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on 02/23/99 - Order of Stay of Execution. The execution of Gregory Leonard is stayed pending resolution of the direct appeal and sentence of death. 99-01339
06/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This is an automatic appeal from a judgment of conviction and a sentence of death. The clerk of the district court shall have 20 days from the date of this order to transmit the record on appeal to this court. The parties are directed to adhere to the following briefing schedule: appellant shall have 70 days from the filing of the record to file and serve the opening brief; respondent shall file and serve the answering brief within 60 days from the service of the opening brief; appellant shall have 45 days from service of the answering brief to file and serve the reply brief. We do not expect requests for extensions of this briefing schedule. 99-04989
06/18/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 18. 99-05290
08/20/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-07786
08/31/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief; respondent shall have 60 days thereafter to file and serve the answering brief; appellant shall serve and file the reply brief, if any, within 45 days after service of the answering brief. 99-08144
11/02/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 99-10662
11/18/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has moved this court for leave to file an opening brief of 205 pages. We deny appellant's motion and direct the clerk to return unfiled the 205-page brief submitted by appellant. We grant appellant permission to file an opening brief of no more than 120 pages. We further direct that the state may file an answering brief of not more than 120 pages. We expect that the 30-page limit for briefs will be sufficient for appellant's reply brief. Appellant shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file and serve his opening brief. Upon the service of that brief, further briefing shall proceed in accordance with SCR 250(60(d). 99-11446
11/18/1999Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned unfiled with letter to attorney JoNell Thomas: original and three copies of Appellant's Opening Brief. 99-10663
12/06/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for reconsideration of order limiting Opening Brief to 120 pages. 99-12156
12/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's request to file an opening brief of 150 pages. Because the brief has been prepared, he shall have seven (7) days from the date of this order to file and serve his opening brief. Upon the service of that brief, further briefing shall proceed in accordance with SCR 250(6)(d). 99-12527
12/23/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 12/20/99 99-13088
01/20/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-00900
01/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Answering Brief due: March 20, 2000. 00-01052
03/20/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-04385
03/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief due: 7 days from the date of this order. We do not expect further requests for extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-04903
03/28/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-04986
03/28/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-04987
04/03/2000MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike State's Answering Brief and Appendix of Record. 00-05297
04/10/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike. 00-05729
04/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court denies appellant's motion to strike the State's answering brief. This court will simply disregard any documents outside of the record or assertations that are not supported by the record. Cause appearing, we grant appellant an extension of time to file the reply brief. Appellant shall be afforded 45 days from the date of this order within which to file the reply brief. 00-06923
05/29/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Change of Address for JoNell Thomas (updated in CMS).
06/12/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 6/9/00. 00-09872
07/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This is an appeal from a judgment of conviction and a sentence of death. It appears that oral argument will be of assistance in resolving the issues presented. The clerk of this court shall schedule this appel for oral argument on the September 2000 en banc oral argument calendar. Oral argument shall be limited to sixty minutes. 00-11507
07/13/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion Requesting Oral Argument Date of September 14, 2000. 00-12126
07/21/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 1 hour in Carson City on September 14, 2000 at 1:30 p.m. (En Banc) 00-12625
08/31/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-15346
09/14/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Panel: En Banc.
09/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On July 13, 2000, appellant filed a motion requesting that "the oral argument in this case be scheduled for September 14, 2000, and not September 15, 2000." Oral argument having been scheduled for and held on September 14, 2000, the motion filed on July 13, 2000, is denied as moot. 00-16833
01/30/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Young, J. We concur: Shearing, J., Agosti, J., and Leavitt, J. fn22[The Honorable Nancy A. Becker, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this appeal.] Maupin, C.J., concurring and dissenting. Rose, J., concurring and dissenting. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 6. 01-01958
02/21/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. 01-03272
03/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the twenty-page petition for rehearing submitted provisionally with appellant's motion on February 21, 2001. 01-03896
03/02/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: 02/16/01. 01-03273
05/08/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." Young, J., Shearing, J., Agosti, J., and Leavitt, J. Maupin, C.J., and Rose, J., dissenting. 01-07666
05/18/2001MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion to Stay Issuance of Remittitur Pending Petition for Writ of Certiorari. 01-08328
05/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We stay the issuance of the remittitur for 60 days from the date of this order pending appellant's application for a writ of certiorari to the United States Supreme Court. If during the sixty-day period the clerk of this court receives notice form the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, this stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. 01-08660
07/25/2001MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion to Stay Issuance of Remittitur Pending Petition for Writ of Certiorari. 01-12596
07/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed July 25, 2001. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until August 22, 2001. If, during the period of the stay, the clerk of this court receives notice from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition, this stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If the clerk of this court does not receive such notice, the clerk shall issue the remittitur on September 3, 2001. 01-12724
09/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-14943
09/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 12, 2001. 01-14943