Case: 05-98-01691-CR
05-98-01691-CR
10/14/1998
Assault or Attempted Murder
Croft, Glen
The State of Texas
No
11th Court of Appeals
12/04/1998
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/01/1999 | Record due | | |
12/04/1998 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/04/1998 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/21/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
10/14/1998 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
10/14/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
10/14/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
10/01/1998 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
09/29/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
09/03/1998 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/04/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Kerry Fitzgerald |
Glen Croft | Criminal - Appellant | Michael E. Miller |
Beverly Dixon | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Dallas Court Reporter, 265th District Court |
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
F98-22251-R
45 yrs