Case: 14-98-01205-CV
14-98-01205-CV
10/15/1998
Landlord\Tenant
Rivas, Jaime Francisco
Glen Willow Apartments, Jennifer Wang and Jane W. Lai, Et Al.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
08/11/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
07/09/1999 | Case stored | | |
03/25/1999 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
03/25/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/25/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/01/1999 | No Pettition for Review FILED | | |
03/01/1999 | Petition for Review DUE | | |
01/29/1999 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
01/29/1999 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
01/14/1999 | Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | GRANTED | |
01/14/1999 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
01/14/1999 | Submitted | | |
01/14/1999 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
01/14/1999 | Submission | | |
01/14/1999 | Submitted | | |
01/13/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/13/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/28/1998 | Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | | |
12/22/1998 | Mediation Docketing Statement FILED | | |
12/17/1998 | Mediation OBJECTION DISP | OVERRULED | |
12/17/1998 | No Reporter's Record TAKEN | | |
12/09/1998 | Objection filed | | |
12/07/1998 | Reporter's Record Due | | |
12/02/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
12/01/1998 | Past due docketing statement | | |
12/01/1998 | Past due mediation docketing statement | | |
11/05/1998 | No Reporter's Record in Civil case FILED | | |
11/02/1998 | Record due | | |
11/02/1998 | Reporter's Record Due | | |
10/25/1998 | Docketing statement DUE | | |
10/19/1998 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |
10/15/1998 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |
10/15/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
10/12/1998 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
09/03/1998 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Rivas, Jaime Francisco | Appellant | Jaime Francisco Rivas |
GLEN WILLOW APARTMENTS, JENNIF | Appellee | Andrew M. Williams |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 2
Harris
Honorable TOM SULLIVAN
661,408