judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DANNY RAY CAPOZZOLI v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-15-0183)
Case Number:S-15-0183Case Docketed On:08/03/2015
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DANNY RAY CAPOZZOLI v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DANNY RAY CAPOZZOLI, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDanny Ray CapozzoliDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPeter K. Michael
David L. Delicath
Christyne Marie Martens

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/03/2015Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/03/2015Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/03/2015Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/16/2015Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/17/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2015Order Granting Appellant's Request for Extension to File BriefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/20/2015Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
10/21/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and WaiverEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/21/2015Order Dismissing AppealOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/21/2015Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal