judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HEATHER A. HARADA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-15-0181)
Case Number:S-15-0181Case Docketed On:07/30/2015
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301
Short Title:HEATHER A. HARADA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:HEATHER A. HARADA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHeather A. HaradaDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPeter K. Michael
David L. Delicath
Christyne Marie Martens
Joshua Charles Eames

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Probation
Opinion Number:2016 WY 19
Citation:368 P.3d 275

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/30/2015Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/30/2015Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/30/2015Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/16/2015Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/16/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received Appellant's Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2015Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/04/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2015Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/24/2015Order - Assigning to brief only docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/24/2015Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2015Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/07/2015Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/16/2016Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming with Justice Hill writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/03/2016Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/03/2016Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/03/2016Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/03/2016Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/08/2016Service - Certified mail signature return card - record received (no date given)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal