judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GOVAN, WALTER UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CF-0863
Short Caption:GOVAN, WALTER UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:07/15/1983

Opening Event Date:07/15/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/30/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/06/1984
Argued/Submitted:09/12/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Michael R. MurpheyYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Elizabeth TrosmanYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GOVAN, WALTER UNITED STATES
07/15/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/30/1984FiledRecord Completed
06/06/1984FiledBriefing Completed
09/12/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/21/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition