Case: 13-90-00046-CV
13-90-00046-CV
02/12/1990
Mandamus
State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Honorable Rogelio Valdez, Judge of the 357th District Court
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/31/1990 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
07/31/1990 | Motion for Leave to File Mandamus | Motion or Writ Denied | |
07/25/1990 | Exhibits received | | |
07/25/1990 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
07/25/1990 | Motion for Leave to File Writ of Mandamus | | |
07/25/1990 | Writ of Mandamus received | | |
06/07/1990 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Otherwise Disposed | |
05/24/1990 | Motion to Withdraw ____________ Filed | | |
05/17/1990 | Miscellaneous Motion | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/17/1990 | Motion for Leave to File Mandamus | Motion or Writ Denied | |
05/15/1990 | Exhibits received | | |
05/15/1990 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |
05/15/1990 | Motion for Leave to File Writ of Mandamus | | |
05/15/1990 | Writ of Mandamus received | | |
03/05/1990 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
02/28/1990 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Dismissed | |
02/28/1990 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/28/1990 | Writ Disposed | Dismissed | |
02/28/1990 | Motion for Leave to File Mandamus | Motion or Writ Denied | |
02/26/1990 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |
02/26/1990 | Submission | | |
02/22/1990 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
02/22/1990 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
02/22/1990 | Notice was filed | | |
02/22/1990 | Notice was filed | | |
02/13/1990 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |
02/13/1990 | Motion for Leave to File Mandamus | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/12/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
02/12/1990 | Brief in support of | | |
02/12/1990 | Filing Fee Paid | | |
02/12/1990 | Motion for Leave to File Writ of Mandamus | | |
02/12/1990 | Oral argument requested | | |
02/12/1990 | Order Entered | | |
02/12/1990 | Writ of Mandamus filed in this Court | | |
02/12/1990 | Writ of Mandamus received | | |
02/12/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/17/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
357th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Rogelio Valdez
89-08-3079E