judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0817-89
PD-0817-89
06/06/1989
PDR Case Type
HOLLAWAY, LAWRENCE GERALD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/15/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/15/1989FINAL DISPRefused
08/30/1989PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1989RESPONSE FILED
06/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
HOLLAWAY, LAWRENCE GERALDApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Bob Wicoff
Court of Appeals Information:
01-88-00747-CR
Aff 4-27-89
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court at Law No 11
Harris
Honorable David Mendoza, Jr.
8805538