Case: 01-90-00116-CV
01-90-00116-CV
02/12/1990
Miscellaneous/other civil
Houston Independent School District and Dr. Joan Raymond
Houston Chronicle Publishing Company
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/22/1991 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
04/22/1991 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
03/15/1991 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
02/06/1991 | Writ disposed | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
12/05/1990 | Case file received by higher Court or agency. | | |
12/03/1990 | Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency | | |
11/21/1990 | Writ filed | | |
11/06/1990 | Date final opinion release for publication | | |
10/25/1990 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
08/30/1990 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
08/17/1990 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
08/09/1990 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
08/09/1990 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
06/05/1990 | Submitted | | |
06/05/1990 | Submission | | |
06/05/1990 | Submitted | | |
05/31/1990 | Motion for more time to orally argue | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
05/25/1990 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
05/23/1990 | Motion for more time to orally argue | | |
05/02/1990 | Supplemental brief filed | | |
04/19/1990 | Motion to adavance appeal disposed | | |
04/10/1990 | Motion to advance or accelerate appeal filed | | |
04/09/1990 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
04/09/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/09/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/06/1990 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
04/06/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/14/1990 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
03/06/1990 | Exhibits filed | | |
03/01/1990 | Motion to supplement record disposed | Grant motion | |
02/15/1990 | Motion to supplement record | | |
02/12/1990 | Filing fee paid | | |
02/12/1990 | Statement of facts filed | | |
02/12/1990 | Transcript filed | | |
02/12/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
12/01/1989 | Appeal bond filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/22/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Appellee | William W. Ogden |
State | Appellant | Kelly Frels |
Trial Court Information
295th District Court
Harris
89-15172