judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-0808-89
PD-0808-89
06/06/1989
PDR Case Type
BARRERA, MANUEL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/15/1989FINAL DISPRefused
08/30/1989PDR DISPRefused
07/10/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
06/06/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/25/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateFred Rodriguez
Barrera, ManuelApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Manuel Barrera
Court of Appeals Information:
04-88-00195-CR
Aff 3-15-89
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
186th District Court
Bexar
Honorable JAMES E. BARLOW
87CR2657