Case: 05-00-00327-CV
05-00-00327-CV
02/29/2000
Summary Judgment
Engines Express, Inc.
Southwestern Bell Yellow Pages, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/13/2018 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
10/14/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
12/21/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |||
12/21/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |||
09/27/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
09/27/2000 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
09/27/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
09/26/2000 | Submission | | |||
09/26/2000 | Submitted | | |||
08/18/2000 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
04/26/2000 | Notice to appellant that brief is late | | |||
03/30/2000 | Brief Due | | |||
03/08/2000 | Notice received | | |||
03/02/2000 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |||
03/02/2000 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||
02/29/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
02/29/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
02/18/2000 | Record due | | |||
12/20/1999 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |||
12/20/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/13/2018 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Southwestern Bell | Appellee | Douglas Edward Lattanzio |
Engines Express | Appellant | James T. Russell |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Dallas
CC-99-7413-A