Case: PD-0472-00
PD-0472-00
02/29/2000
PDR Case Type
PENA, EX PARTE STEVE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/2000 | MOTION RECEIVED | | |
03/29/2000 | MOTION RECEIVED | | |
03/24/2000 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
03/20/2000 | REHEAR EXT MOTION | DENIED | |
03/20/2000 | REHEAR EXT MOTION | DENIED | |
03/08/2000 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
03/08/2000 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
02/29/2000 | PDR FILED | | |
02/29/2000 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/31/2000 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | STATE OF TEXAS EX REL SUSAN D. REED |
PENA, EX PARTE STEVE | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Steve Pena |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-99-00494-CR
AFF 1-26-00
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
290th District Court
Bexar
Honorable ANDREW CARRUTHERS
99-W-0119