Case: 04-89-00601-CV
04-89-00601-CV
12/04/1989
Contract
First Security Mortgage Co. and Crossland Mortgage Corp.
McDonald's Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/08/1991 | Original Exhibits Returned | | |
03/08/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/08/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/11/1991 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
12/17/1990 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
11/30/1990 | Opinion issued | Reversed & Rendered in Part/Affirm as Reformed | |
11/30/1990 | Opinion issued | Reversed & Rendered in Part/Affirm as Reformed | |
05/17/1990 | Submitted | | |
05/17/1990 | Submission | | |
05/17/1990 | Submitted | | |
05/09/1990 | Reply brief filed | | |
03/23/1990 | Submission | | |
03/07/1990 | Exhibits Filed | | |
02/23/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/23/1990 | Motion for Leave Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/23/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/16/1990 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
02/16/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
02/15/1990 | Verification Filed | | |
02/07/1990 | Motion for Leave Filed | | |
01/25/1990 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/22/1990 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
01/08/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
01/08/1990 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
12/08/1989 | Exhibits Filed | | |
12/08/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
12/04/1989 | No Description Available. | | |
12/04/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
11/08/1989 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
08/10/1989 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/08/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
First Security Mortgage Co.,et | Appellant | Richard T. Miller |
Trial Court Information
45th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Truman Roberts
86-CI-22271
n/a