judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVENS (LEO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34651
Short Caption:STEVENS (LEO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C104565Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/06/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/11/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/11/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07428
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34600, 34624, 34634, 34650, 34651, 34659, 34662. 99-09664
01/06/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 01/04/00. 00-00233
01/06/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09756
07/10/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10316
07/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2001. 01-10316