judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RON RETZ, an individual; ERNEST WILLIAMS, individually and as trustee for nieces and nephews of the decedent, William C. Rogers; ANNE BURWELL WILLIAMS, individually and as co-trustee for the nieces and nephews of the decedent, William C. Rogers; FRED CROUTER, individually and as trustee of the Ada Crouter Trust; AND BEVERLY CROUTER, an individual, v. WILLIAM SIEBRANDT, an individual; SALVADOR ZARATE, an individual; CHARLES E. GRAVES, in his capacity as Successor Trustee of the Living Trust of WILLIAM C. ROGERS, deceased, and THE UNIVERSITY OF WYOMING FOUNDATION, a Wyoming nonprofit corporation

Case Heading (S-07-0023)
Case Number:S-07-0023Case Docketed On:01/29/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:RON RETZ, an individual; ERNEST WILLIAMS, individually and as trustee for nieces and nephews of the decedent, William C. Rogers; ANNE BURWELL WILLIAMS, individually and as co-trustee for the nieces and nephews of the decedent, William C. Rogers; FRED CROUTER, individually and as trustee of the Ada Crouter Trust; AND BEVERLY CROUTER, an individual, v. WILLIAM SIEBRANDT, an individual; SALVADOR ZARATE, an individual; CHARLES E. GRAVES, in his capacity as Successor Trustee of the Living Trust of WILLIAM C. ROGERS, deceased, and THE UNIVERSITY OF WYOMING FOUNDATION, a Wyoming nonprofit corporation
Full Title:RON RETZ, an individual; ERNEST WILLIAMS, individually and as trustee for nieces and nephews of the decedent, William C. Rogers; ANNE BURWELL WILLIAMS, individually and as co-trustee for the nieces and nephews of the decedent, William C. Rogers; FRED CROUTER, individually and as trustee of the Ada Crouter Trust; AND BEVERLY CROUTER, an individual, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. WILLIAM SIEBRANDT, an individual; SALVADOR ZARATE, an individual; CHARLES E. GRAVES, in his capacity as Successor Trustee of the Living Trust of WILLIAM C. ROGERS, deceased, Appellees (Defendants), and THE UNIVERSITY OF WYOMING FOUNDATION, a Wyoming nonprofit corporation, Appellee (Nominal Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRon RetzSteve C.M. Aron
Mattaniah Eytan
AppellantErnest WilliamsSteve C.M. Aron
Mattaniah Eytan
AppellantAnne Burwell WilliamsSteve C.M. Aron
Mattaniah Eytan
AppellantFred CrouterSteve C.M. Aron
Mattaniah Eytan
AppellantBeverly CrouterSteve C.M. Aron
Mattaniah Eytan
AppelleeWilliam SiebrantPhilip A. Nicholas
Jason M. Tangeman
AppelleeSalvador ZaratePhilip A. Nicholas
Jason M. Tangeman
AppelleeCharles E. GravesPaul J. Hickey
Roger Fransen
AppelleeWilliam C. Rogers
AppelleeThe University of Wyoming FoundationGregory C. Dyekman
Timothy Lance Woznick

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Contracts, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 44
Citation:181 P.3d 84

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/29/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/29/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - copy of defendant's objection to costs filed in the district court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/02/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantsMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/02/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/02/2007Motion - Admission pro hac vice - Mattaniah EytanMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
03/02/2007Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Mattaniah EytanOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
04/18/2007Brief - Appellants Ron Retz, Ernest Williams, and Anne Burweell Williams; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
04/18/2007Brief - Appellants Fred Crouter and Beverly Crouter; received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
04/18/2007Motion - Other; to file two briefs (of appellant) and two factual appendices.MotionOtherFinal
04/18/2007Service - Certificate of service for all pleadings filed by appellantsServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
05/07/2007Response/Objection - Motion to file two briefs and two factual appendicesResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/07/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntary and motion to strike (motion was incorporated into the response to motion to file two briefs)MotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
05/07/2007Response/Objection - Motion to file two briefs and two factual appendicesResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/07/2007Motion - Dismiss - involuntary joinder of University of Wyoming Foundation in appellants (sic) motion to strikeMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
05/07/2007Response/Objection - Motion. Appellee Charles Graves' joinder in appellees Siebrandt's and Zarate's opposition to appellants' motion to file two briefs and two factual appendices, motion to stike and motion to dismiss.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/08/2007Order - Other (allowing) motion to file two briefs and order denying motion to file two factual appendicesOrderOtherFinal
05/15/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellees by Siebrant and ZarateMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/17/2007Order - Grant - extension of time to appellees Siebrandt and ZarateOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/21/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief. Appellee Charles Graves' motion for extension of time to file opening brief.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/21/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief. Appellee the University of Wyoming Foundation's motion for extension of time to file brief.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/22/2007Order - Grant - extension of time. Order granting appellee Charles Graves' motion for extension of time to file opening brief.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/22/2007Order - Grant - extension of time. Order granting appellee University of Wyoming Foundation's request for extension to file brief.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/25/2007Response/Objection - Motion to strike and motion to dismissResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
06/05/2007Order - Denying motion to strike and denying motion to dismiss appealOrderDenyFinal
07/05/2007Brief - Appellee - The University of Wyoming Foundation; and received copy of brief on cd.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/05/2007Brief - Appellees William Siebrand and Salvador Zarate; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/05/2007Brief - Appellee Charles E. Graves; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/13/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief (appellant's reply).MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/15/2007Motion - Supplement the record; and points and authorities in support of appellants' rule 3.04 motion.MotionSupplement the recordFinal
08/15/2007Affidavit - Other. Affidavit of C.M. Aron in support of appellants' rule 3.04 motion to supplement record.AffidavitOtherFinal
08/15/2007Affidavit - Other. Affidavit of Mattaniah Eytan in support of appellants' rule 3.04 motion to supplement record.AffidavitOtherFinal
08/15/2007Service - Certificate of serviceServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
08/15/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo. Justice Kite recused.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
08/17/2007Service - Other - received postage paid, self addressed envelope to return file stamped copy of appellants' motion to supplement recordServiceOtherFinal
08/20/2007Motion - Oral argument - motion of Appellee Charles E. Graves to reschedule oral argument to September 20, 2007MotionOral argument - vacateFinal
08/22/2007Order - Deny - Order denying motion to reschedule setting for oral argument.OrderDenyFinal
08/22/2007Order - Assignment of judge - Judge Ryckman for Justice Kite.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
08/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/22/2007Brief - Appellant reply. Appellants' reply to brief of appellees William Siebrandt and Salvador Zarate; received copy of brief on disk; copy of designation of record of appeal; and certificate of service.BriefAppellant replyFinal
08/22/2007Brief - Appellant reply. Appellants' reply to opening brief of appellee Charles E. Graves, successor trustee of the living trust of William C. Rogers; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellant replyFinal
08/22/2007Brief - Appellant reply. Appellants' reply to brief of appellee the University of Wyoming Foundation; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellant replyFinal
08/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jason Tangeman for appellees Siebrandt and ZarateNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/27/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, thirteen volumes. Volumes I-XII, original papers; Volume XIII, transcripts and exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/27/2007Response/Objection - Motion to supplement recordResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/05/2007Order - Grant - Motion to Supplement the record. (Supplement attached to motion - no further action).OrderGrantFinal
09/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - C.M. Aron and Mattaniah Eytan for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/13/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paul Hickey for appellee Charles E. Graves, Trustee; and Greg Dyekman will not present argument for University of Wyoming Foundation.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/18/2007Motion - Withdrawal of counsel, Brandi L. MongerMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
09/18/2007Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
09/18/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke, and Ryckman, District Judge (Steve C.M. Aron and Mattaniah Eytan, argument by Mr. Eytan for appellants; Paul J. Hickey, Jason M. Tangeman and Timothy Lance Woznick for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/18/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/11/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/11/2008Event - Phone Call. Called Anthony, Nicholas & Tangeman, LLC regarding opinion and was informed that Mr. Anthony had passed away.EventPhone CallFinal
04/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
05/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - proposed order awarding costs and self-addressed stamped envelopeNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/20/2008Order - Other. Order on appellees' certificate of costs.OrderOtherFinal
05/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/20/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/20/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/22/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cards. Two (2) boxes signed for 5/21/08 by M. Trabing.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal