Case: 01-89-01157-CR
01-89-01157-CR
12/01/1989
Assault & battery
DeValentino, Renauldo
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/29/1991 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
04/29/1991 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
04/22/1991 | Date final opinion release for publication | | |
03/23/1991 | No petition for review or writ of error was filed | | |
03/08/1991 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
02/21/1991 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
02/21/1991 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
11/21/1990 | Submitted | | |
11/21/1990 | Submission | | |
11/21/1990 | Submitted | | |
10/05/1990 | Submission | | |
07/26/1990 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
07/26/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/26/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/25/1990 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
07/13/1990 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
06/15/1990 | Brief filed-oral argument has been waived | | |
05/31/1990 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
05/16/1990 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
04/16/1990 | Statement of facts filed | | |
04/05/1990 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
03/22/1990 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
02/08/1990 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
01/29/1990 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
01/23/1990 | Transcript filed | | |
12/03/1989 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | | |
12/01/1989 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
12/01/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/29/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Criminal - State of Texas | Jim Mapel |
State | Criminal - Appellant | John J. Browne |
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Brazoria
19,780
2 yrs tdc