Case Information: 37093 | |||
Short Caption: | COUNTY OF ELKO VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 29758 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/07/2000 / Allison, George | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/04/2000 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger. | ||
12/04/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/04/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. | 00-21099 | |
12/04/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
12/07/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: George V. Allison. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
01/11/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Frankie Sue Del Papa, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, and hereby notify this Court that Senior Deputy Attorney General David Wasick has assumed the responsibility for representing the Respondent. | 01-00730 | |
03/02/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 4, 2001. | 01-03877 | |
05/07/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 01-07629 | |
05/07/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days | ||
06/28/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement negotiations are still continuing. | 01-11019 | |
11/30/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 01-20130 | |
12/04/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 01-20296 | |
12/13/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 01-20968 | |
12/13/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |